skip to content

Lindsay, Peter Alfred

CPSO#: 30590

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jun 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter Lindsay Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 11 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Campus Department of Anaesthesia 800 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 11 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016