skip to content

Lindsay, David Ian

CPSO#: 27860

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2021
EXPIRY DATE
09 Aug 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
49 High Street
Suite 203
Barrie ON  L4N 5J4
Phone: (705) 722-3443 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ian Lindsay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2021