skip to content

Lindsay, Ardis Brian

CPSO#: 26766

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ardis B. Lindsay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 108, 309 Park Street, Brockville, ON K6V 6E5
Instructions: Contact Dr. Kevin Leonard for records
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015