skip to content

Lin, Nancy Nancy

CPSO#: 91316

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:Our Lady of Fatima University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
9 EW - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5349
Fax: 416 603 5912 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

130 Dundas Street West #3
Toronto ON  M5G 1C3
Canada
Phone: 416 493 4242
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lin ( CPSO# 91316 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 9 E W
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5349

Business Address:
201 - 3660 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1V 0B8
Phone Number: (416) 479-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:13 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NANCY NANCY LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015