skip to content

Lin, Lily Qing

CPSO#: 96841

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Oct 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:14 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2011 to 28 Oct 2011
EL - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 26 Oct 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
EL - Pediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2015