skip to content

Lin, Daren

CPSO#: 86947

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
131 Frederick Campbell St
Fergus ON  N1M 0H3
Phone: (519) 843-2010 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 821-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

110 Charles St East
Arthur ON  N0G 1A0
Canada
Phone: (519) 8483798
Fax: 5198486373
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lin Dzaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lin ( CPSO# 86947 )
Dr. N. Dzaja ( CPSO# 86963 )

Business Address:
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Business Address:
89 Dawson Road
Suite 208
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 265-7477

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAREN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009