skip to content

Lin, Cheng

CPSO#: 96015

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Dept of Anes & Perioperative Med
Room C2-168
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. Page 15896 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cheng Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 5 2022
Corporation Name: Cheng Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lin ( CPSO# 96015 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Rd E
C2-168
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHENG LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2016