skip to content

Lim, Terence Chun Wei

CPSO#: 98176

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
171 Guelph St
Georgetown
L7G 4A1
Georgetown ON  L7G 4A1
Phone: (905) 877-4123
Fax: (905) 873-8882 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Terence Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lim ( CPSO# 98176 )

Business Address:
171 Guelph Street
Georgetown ON  L7G 4A1
Phone Number: (905) 877-0233

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TERENCE CHUN WEI LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014