skip to content

Lim, Solina Sun Kyung

CPSO#: 97886

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: Yoo, Solina Sun Kyung (used until: 15 Aug 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2Z1
Phone: (416) 7852500 Ext. 2488
Fax: (416) 7852409 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SOLINA SUN KYUNG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2016