skip to content

Lim, Siok Hoon

CPSO#: 87101

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Singapore, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 555 University Avenue Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 30 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Research Fellows - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2015