skip to content

Lim, Michael Do

CPSO#: 88352

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site - ER department
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lim ( CPSO# 88352 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
2867 Ellsemere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DO LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010