skip to content

Lim, Gloria

CPSO#: 86214

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Donnelly wing, 2-084
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5389
Fax: (416) 864-3055 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

201-600 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Canada
Phone: 416-922-5652
Fax: 416-633-7671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gloria Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lim ( CPSO# 86214 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room 2-084
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5389

Business Address:
600 Sherbourne St
Suite 201
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:13 Jan 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GLORIA LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2013