skip to content

Lim, Chern Weng

CPSO#: 90329

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Malay, Mandarin

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
325 Milner Avenue, Suite 410
Toronto ON  M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Chern Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lim ( CPSO# 90329 )

Business Address:
407-2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHERN WENG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 06 Apr 2009 to 01 May 2009
EL - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2012