skip to content

Lim, Charles Henry

CPSO#: 98330

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5130
Fax: (905) 813-4024 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lim ( CPSO# 98330 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHARLES HENRY LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016