skip to content

Lily, Muriel

CPSO#: 91268

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
North York ON  M3J 3N4
Phone: (416) 739-1562 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Lily Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lily ( CPSO# 91268 )

Business Address:
1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4

Business Address:
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
North York ON  M3J 3N4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MURIEL LILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LILY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2012