skip to content

Lilani, Rizwana Nisar

CPSO#: 92133

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:Ziauddin Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105-191 McNaughton Rd E
Maple ON  L6A 4E2
Phone: 905-303-1770
Fax: 905-303-1727 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 9058831212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Residential Care Village
640 Grace Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8V7
Canada
Phone: 905-895-7661
Fax: 905-895-9806
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Family Medicine Dept.
Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y2P9
Canada
Phone: 905-895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Ross Memorial Hospital
Hospitalist
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: 705-324-6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rizwana Lilani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lilani ( CPSO# 92133 )

Business Address:
9699 Jane Street
Unit 20
Maple ON  L6A 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 303-1770


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RIZWANA NISAR LILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LILANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010