skip to content

Ligate, Loys Jane

CPSO#: 32260

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 18 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L.J. Ligate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 11 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Grand Valley Institute for Women 1575 Homer Watson Blvd Kitchener ON N2P 2C5 Or 80 Waterloo Ave Guelph ON N1H 0A1
Date Received: 12 Dec 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Dec 2018