skip to content

Liederman, Zachary Harris

CPSO#: 97592

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Blood Disorders Program
9NU993
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4069
Fax: 416-340-3799 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Zachary Liederman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Liederman ( CPSO# 97592 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
9NU993
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4069

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:03 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZACHARY HARRIS LIEDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEDERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016