skip to content

Librach, Samuel

CPSO#: 15480

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sam Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 23 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Effective Sept 1, 2013, records are to be stored at Records Management Ltd., 1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13, Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Instructions: Call toll free at 1.800.775.0093, or www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 29 Aug 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 Nov 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015