skip to content

Libman, Robert Nelson

CPSO#: 25680

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Center
2550A Finch Avenue West
Weston ON  M9M 2G3
Phone: (416) 749-5291
Fax: (416) 749-6598 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Libman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Libman ( CPSO# 25680 )
Dr. E. Libman ( CPSO# 32713 )

Business Address:
Medical Center
2550A Finch Avenue West
Weston ON  M9M 2G3
Phone Number: (416) 749-5291

Business Address:
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone Number: (905) 881-6667


Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Harold Isenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Libman ( CPSO# 25680 )
Dr. J. Isenberg ( CPSO# 60031 )

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-9228


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT NELSON LIBMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIBMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1973