skip to content

Liaw, Yih-Chen

CPSO#: 23884

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Indonesian

Education:National Taiwan University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Diagnostic Imaging Consultants
300 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone: (905) 731-4001 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YIH-CHEN LIAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2011