skip to content

Liau, Siong Seng

CPSO#: 99841

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 29 Jan 2013 to 19 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2014