skip to content

Liao, Walter Nathan

CPSO#: 91281

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310B
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 299-1484 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Walter N. Liao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Liao ( CPSO# 91281 )

Business Address:
Suite 310B
4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 299-1484

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WALTER NATHAN LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014