skip to content

Liang, Stephen

CPSO#: 26778

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHEN LIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1974