skip to content

Liang, Lorna Lo Kwong

CPSO#: 29895

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jan 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 2013

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: January 31, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Lorna Lo Kwong Liang has resigned from the College, effective January 31, 2013.