skip to content

Li, Yu

CPSO#: 95285

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 - 785 Wonderland Rd. S
2nd Floor, Westmount Mall
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: 5196416712
Fax: 5196416189 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yu Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Li ( CPSO# 95285 )

Business Address:
200 - 785 Wonderland Road South
2nd Floor, Westmount Mall
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 642-6712


Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YU LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013