skip to content

Li, Xiaobin

CPSO#: 92013

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Bowman Gray of Wake Forest University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1935 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 8A3
Phone: (613) 521-2391 Ext. 164
Fax: (613) 521-5443 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

117 Banting Dr
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: (613) 584-3333
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

75 Spring St
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Xiaobin Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Li ( CPSO# 92013 )

Business Address:
1935 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 8A3
Phone Number: (613) 521-2391

Business Address:
117 Banting Drive
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Phone Number: (613) 584-3333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. XIAOBIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009