skip to content

Li, Qi

CPSO#: 88213

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:West China Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2008 to 16 Jul 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2012 to 10 Jan 2013
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013