skip to content

Li, Melinda Yuk-Ting

CPSO#: 98162

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Rm 19-104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Melinda Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Li ( CPSO# 98162 )

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Room 7-405 to 409
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: 416-586-5270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELINDA YUK-TING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2020 to 31 Mar 2020
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018