skip to content

Li, Kunmin Karen

CPSO#: 98591

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centretown Community Health Centre
420 Cooper Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2N6
Phone: (613) 233-4697
Fax: (613) 233-4541 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Akausivik Inuit Family Health Team
Suite 300
24 Selkirk Street
Ottawa ON  K1L 0A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 740-0999
Fax: (613) 740-0991
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KUNMIN KAREN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014