skip to content

Li, Katy Yi-Ting

CPSO#: 95100

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
532 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 4H4
Phone: (905) 646-0015 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 9053784647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Katy Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Li ( CPSO# 95100 )

Business Address:
532 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 4H4
Phone Number: (905) 646-0015

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATY YI-TING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2014