skip to content

Li, Juliana Jing

CPSO#: 86546

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Adult Ambulatory Mental Health Care
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room A2 - 650
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 74735
Fax: 519-667-6836 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:28 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIANA JING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2013