skip to content

Li, Jennifer Yan Lun

CPSO#: 93360

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 lake ave south
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V1
Phone: 905-664-9992
Fax: 905-664-9910 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer YL Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Li ( CPSO# 93360 )

Business Address:
9 Lake Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V1
Phone Number: (905) 664-9992

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER YAN LUN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Pediatrics

Western University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2016