skip to content

Li, Donna Rebecca

CPSO#: 91626

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Guyana, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
15 Westney Road North
Ajax ON  L1T 1P4
Phone: (905) 428-8055
Fax: (905) 428-1501 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

4158 Sheppard Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T3
Canada
Phone: 647 267 2176 Ext. 1
Fax: 647 493 3121
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Donna Rebecca Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Li ( CPSO# 91626 )

Business Address:
4158 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T3
Phone Number: (647) 267-2176

Business Address:
Unit 2
15 Westney Road North
Ajax ON  L1T 1P4
Phone Number: (905) 428-8055

Business Address:
1256 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1E5
Phone Number: (416) 261-3500

Business Address:
857 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N6
Phone Number: (416) 287-3611

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONNA REBECCA LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011