Li, Brian Heng (CPSO#: 100974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing 5-466
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416)603-5815
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7373
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian H. Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Li ( CPSO# 100974)

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7373

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN HENG LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017