skip to content

Li, Adrienne Louise Kit

CPSO#: 95158

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 606
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: 905-488-5988
Fax: 905-248-3636 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Adrienne Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Li ( CPSO# 95158 )

Business Address:
219 - 2190 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 488-5988

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:18 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE LOUISE KIT LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016