skip to content

Leyser, Marcio

CPSO#: 100047

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade de Caxias do Sul, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 09 Apr 2013 to 14 Jun 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Developmental Paediatrics

McMaster University, 15 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Developmental Paediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2014