skip to content

Lewis, William Frederick

CPSO#: 30108

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1977 to 14 Jun 1978
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2015