skip to content

Lewis, Trevor George

CPSO#: 26990

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Sep 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Dublin, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2470 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M2L 1A7
Phone: (416) 441-9787
Fax: (416) 441-0126 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Trevor George Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TREVOR GEORGE LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1974

Concerns

Source: Fitness to Practice Committee
Active Date: May 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Update: As of October 26, 2020, the member has completed all elements of the SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

SCERP Summary:

On May 16, 2018, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required medical psychotherapist, Dr. Trevor George Lewis, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Lewis to:

Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the following courses and certificate programs:

Basic Pharmacology in Mental Health and Substance Use Online Course offered through CAMH;

22nd Annual McMaster Muskoka Seminar Series: The Management of Simple and Complex Post Traumatic Stress;

University of Toronto Medical Record-Keeping Course; and

Cognitive Behavioural Certificate Program offered through CAMH or equivalent.

Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months;

Review the following policies, guidelines or tools with reference to how each is applicable to family medicine:

CPSO Policy #1-11: Test Results Management
CPSO Policy #4-12: Medical Records

Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately 6 months following the completion of the Education Plan.