skip to content

Lewis, Jillian Monique

CPSO#: 88007

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 20 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016