skip to content

Lewis, Jacqueline Esther

CPSO#: 29447

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 02 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Oct 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015