skip to content

Lewis, Geraint Wyn

CPSO#: 31624

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Welsh

Education:Welsh National School of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Geraint W. Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 11 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016