skip to content

Lewis, Evan Cole

CPSO#: 89200

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Neurology Centre of Toronto
491 Eglinton Ave. West
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: 416 860-7554
Fax: (416) 860-7559 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: EC Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lewis ( CPSO# 89200 )

Business Address:
100-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: 4168607554

Business Address:
Kindercare Pediatrics
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Unit 100
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 860-7554


Corporation Name: Lewis & Flanders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Flanders ( CPSO# 77729 )
Dr. E. Lewis ( CPSO# 89200 )

Business Address:
Neurology Centre of Toronto
100 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 860-7554

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EVAN COLE LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 07 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2014