skip to content

Lewis, Arthur Franklyn

CPSO#: 19427

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jan 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jan 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 15-Dec-2005

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2002

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: November 22, 2004
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 22, 2004, Dr. Arthur Franklyn Lewis has undertaken to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario,
-- to permanently cease to practise psychotherapy,
-- not to engage in any other form of individual treatment, psychological or otherwise,
with anyone who has not attained the age of majority,
-- not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in
any jursidiction.