skip to content

Lewin, James Arthur

CPSO#: 17368

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 9-Jan-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 1999