skip to content

Lewin, Gabriela Analia

CPSO#: 84761

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Apr 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
305 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 728-7700 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gabriela Lewin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lewin ( CPSO# 84761 )

Business Address:
305 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 728-7700

Business Address:
543Somerset Street West
Ottawa ON  K1R 5Z9
Phone Number: (613) 237-9595

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GABRIELA ANALIA LEWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2008