skip to content

Lewandowski, Bernard Joseph

CPSO#: 28230

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bernard Lewandowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2018