skip to content

Levitz, Joshua Adam

CPSO#: 98109

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave. W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Ext. 6241 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Levitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Levitz ( CPSO# 98109 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSHUA ADAM LEVITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2016