skip to content

Levis, Ruth Elizabeth

CPSO#: 97837

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Reginal Paediatric Services
Consulting Group
274 Dundas Street East
Suite 305
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: 613-779-7575
Fax: 613-779-8686 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ruth Levis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levis ( CPSO# 97837 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care
Regional Paediatrics Services
Consulting Group
305-274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 779-7575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUTH ELIZABETH LEVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2021

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 5, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)