skip to content

Levine, Richard Harold

CPSO#: 32462

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
149 Second Avenue
Suite 202
Ottawa ON  K1S 2H6
Phone: (613) 594-4935
Fax: (613) 594-4935 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Levine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 32462 )

Business Address:
149 Second Avenue
Suite 202
Ottawa ON  K1S 2H6
Phone Number: (613) 594-4935

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD HAROLD LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1985